THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 0:59:40 AM
Ho, Thanh-Cat
CPSO#:
104074
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Toronto, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1338 Fourth Avenue
Suite S100
St Catharines ON L2S 0G1
Phone: 905-984-3335
Fax: 9059846008
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THANH-CAT HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2017 |