THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:21:25 PM
Phua, Peter Daniel
CPSO#:
103982
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P.D.Phua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Apr 2023 |