THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:42:36 AM
Ajani, Adenike Frances
CPSO#:
103960
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1144 Wilson Street W
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Phone: 905-648-2666
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Nigeria
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADENIKE FRANCES AJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
EL - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 07 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 08 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2016 |