THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:36:38 AM
Bock, Graeme Benjamin
CPSO#:
103945
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Graeme Bock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Office of Dr. Graeme Bock and Dr. Marriott
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin, Ontario
N0H 2C3
Date Received: 15 Jun 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jan 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |