THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:50:24 AM
Rextin, Gulrukh Samina
CPSO#:
103850
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London InterCommunity Health Centre
Unit 7
1355 Huron Street
London ON N5V 1R9
Phone: (519) 659-6399
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GULRUKH SAMINA REXTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REXTIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |