THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 2:44:53 AM
Hall, Jena
CPSO#:
103770
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
23 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Elective)
as of
12 Dec 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Trudy M. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 27 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 25 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2022 to 09 Dec 2022
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 12 Dec 2022 to 23 Dec 2022
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Dec 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Dec 2022 |