THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:38:31 AM
Maxwell, Sarah Kathleen
CPSO#:
103751
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: HB Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Dec 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 22 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 28 Sep 2017 to 24 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 25 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 25 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 17 Nov 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 18 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 02 Dec 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 03 Dec 2020 to 30 Dec 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 31 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2021 |