THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:05:33 PM
Maddison, Andre Ralph
CPSO#:
103680
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
3rd Floor
St Catharines ON L2S0A9
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 46412
Fax: 9056846411
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jul 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDRE RALPH MADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADDISON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 24 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2018 |