THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:02:38 AM
Wilkie, Heather Lynn
CPSO#:
103674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
MacTavish, Heather Lynn (used until: 07 Aug 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5400 Portage Rd
Suite 604
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Phone: (905) 354-2323
Fax: (905) 354-2249
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNN WILKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2016 |