THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:36:42 PM
Tatham, Barbara Lee
CPSO#:
103665
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
16-Oct-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Brian Tatham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 23 2024
Corporation Name: Barbara Tatham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences
800 Commissioners Rd E, London, ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 31 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2019 |