THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:23:05 PM
Chooback, Negar
CPSO#:
103541
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEGAR CHOOBACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOOBACK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2017 |