THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:15:17 AM
Eras, Danielle Marie
CPSO#:
103503
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 346-1240
Fax: (807) 346-8687
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE ERAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2017 |