THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:50:48 AM
Webster, William Andrew
CPSO#:
103435
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
First Capital Health
1475 John Counter Blvd.
Suite 103
Kingston ON K7M 0E6
Phone: (613) 531-7773
Fax: (613) 531-7774
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ANDREW WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2017 |