THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:51:26 PM
Sharifian, Babak
CPSO#:
103402
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BABAK SHARIFIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIFIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2014 to 16 Jun 2014
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2015 |