THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:07:13 PM
Akladios, Fady
CPSO#:
103397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
55 Woodlawn Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 3K7
Phone: 9052733176
Fax: 9058481500
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FADY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2016 |