THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:40:46 PM
Kambo, Jaspreet Singh
CPSO#:
103395
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 07 Aug 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:06 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2014 to 29 Jun 2014
EL - Infectious Diseases
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2018 |