THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:55:03 PM
Malcolm, Kristin Marie
CPSO#:
103378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site |
Meaford |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2017 to 02 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2018 to 16 Dec 2018
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2017 |