THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:53:11 AM
Piggott, Thomas William
CPSO#:
103365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2nd-185 King St
Peterborough ON K9J 2R8
Phone: 705-743-1000
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS WILLIAM PIGGOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIGGOTT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator Program
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator Program
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
CF - Clinician Investigator Program
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2021 |