THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:10:20 PM
Malone, Steven Michael
CPSO#:
103222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Ave. Suite 128
Windsor, Ontario
Canada
Windsor ON N8X3V6
Phone: 5199461201
Fax: 5199460253
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jul 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN MICHAEL MALONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2016 |