THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:43:45 AM
Selby, Emily Brigitta
CPSO#:
103203
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bruckschwaiger, Emily Brigitta (used until: 13 Nov 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY BRIGITTA SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 29 Aug 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |