THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:25:39 PM
Khosla, Smriti
CPSO#:
103195
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Milton Centre for Women's Health
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON L9T 3Z9
Phone: 905-875-2280
Fax: 905-875-9172
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SMRITI KHOSLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 14 Jan 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2020 |