THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:29:47 AM
Fitzpatrick, Aisling Michelle
CPSO#:
103148
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AISLING MICHELLE FITZPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FITZPATRICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |