THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:25:51 AM
Cusimano, Maria Christine
CPSO#:
103140
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Mall Rd
Lahey Hospital & Medical Center
Department of Gynecology
Burlington ON 01805-0002
United States
Phone: 781-744-8560
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Sep 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA CHRISTINE CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Mar 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2022 |