THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:08:26 PM
Higgins, James Patrick
CPSO#:
103058
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
208-25 Industrial St
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: (416) 441-2245
Fax: (416) 441-2246
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK HIGGINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIGGINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |