THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:52:08 AM
Miserachs Barba, Maria del Mar
CPSO#:
103037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Catalan, English, Spanish
Education: University of Barcelona, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6122
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |