THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:30:41 AM
Eustace, Gregory James
CPSO#:
103035
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-3420 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J6
Phone: 9058207171
Fax: 9054171133
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:03 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY JAMES EUSTACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EUSTACE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 02 Jun 2014 to 27 Jun 2014
EL - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 22 Aug 2014
EL - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2018 |