THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:58:51 PM
Hamid, Zinia
CPSO#:
102895
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Chittagong, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4 Johnson Ave
Miramichi NB E1N 3B7
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2022 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZINIA HAMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMID is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 May 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2023 |