THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:20:03 AM
Fu, Lisa Wenyang
CPSO#:
102710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Drug Safety Clinic
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:04 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA WENYANG FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 10 Mar 2014 to 06 Apr 2014
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 01 Jun 2014
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2016 |