THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:24:34 PM
Satz, Stephanie L
CPSO#:
102662
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Medical Centre
7875 Riverside Drive East
Windsor ON N8S 1E1
Phone: (519) 944-1118
Fax: 519944-5415
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Feb 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Feb 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2016 |
|
Active |