THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:55:25 AM
Fazeli, Zhila
CPSO#:
102638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
504-7191 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Phone: 647 429 0011
Fax: 365 523 2626
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZHILA FAZELI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAZELI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2014 to 16 May 2014
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 17 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2019 |