THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:57:08 AM
Poolacherla, Yuva Raju
CPSO#:
102562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu
Education: University of Madras, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia &
Peioperative Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine
C3-172 339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:22 Jan 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jan 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2022 |
|
Active |