THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:17:50 PM
Owoeye, Olabisi Idowu
CPSO#:
102557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa
K1Z7K4
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 7226521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jan 2014 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
|
Active |