THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:26:26 AM
Brar, Sandeep Kaur
CPSO#:
102541
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Calgary, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sandeep Brar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2014 to 07 Mar 2014
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 27 Apr 2014
EL - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 14 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2019 |