THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:47:48 AM
Le, Trung Ngoc
CPSO#:
102424
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Manitoba, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Otolaryngology-Head & Neck Surgery
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1.102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4141
Fax: (416) 480-5761
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TRUNG NGOC LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2014 to 17 Jan 2014
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2016 |