THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:30:35 AM
Sapisochin Cantis, Gonzalo
CPSO#:
102401
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University Complutense of Madrid, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
585 University Avenue. 11PMB184
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5169
Fax: 416 340 3237
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 20 Mar 2014
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2021 |
|
Active |