THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:38:08 AM
Ogugua, Chukwuma Stephen
CPSO#:
102335
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Igbo
Education: University of Nigeria, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C.S. Ogugua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 29 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina
USA - South Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2021 |