THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:44:19 PM
Kumar, Rishi
CPSO#:
102325
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Nova Southeastern University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V1R8
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 32362
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:05 Nov 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
|
Active |