THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:51:17 AM
Khayat, Eman Abdulrahman Abdullah
CPSO#:
102303
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2013 to 20 Jan 2014
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2017 |