THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:31:55 AM
Villalobos Vazquez, Alejandra
CPSO#:
102292
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad De Guadalajara, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Internal referrals only
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 3889
Fax: (905) 883-2181
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:24 Oct 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
|
Active |