THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:44:04 AM
Hussain, Shabbir
CPSO#:
102276
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
55 Dundas St East
Toronto ON M5B 1C6
Phone: 416-361-6000 Ext. 1
Fax: 416-361-6044
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHABBIR HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 26 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2022 |