THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:15:12 PM
Hussain, Balal
CPSO#:
102274
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dorwin Medical Group
2469 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON N8X1T3
Phone: 5199161446
Fax: 5199160649
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Oct 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 30 Nov 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 30 Nov 2021 |
|
Active |