THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:56:42 PM
Nagari Nandieshwar, Satyadev
CPSO#:
102268
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Forensic Psychiatry Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39383
Fax: (905) 381-5606
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 21 Nov 2013
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 22 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 04 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Sep 2015
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2016 |
|
Active |