THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:07:43 AM
Sprague, Celia Ann
CPSO#:
102252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
P O Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1B8
Phone: (807) 737 3030
Fax: 807 737 4866
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. C. Sprague Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CELIA ANN SPRAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRAGUE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2014 |