THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:04:39 AM
Nguyen, Linda
CPSO#:
102210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sint Eustatius, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit K
16 Yonge St
Toronto ON M5E 2A1
Phone: (416) 258-2551
Fax: (416) 266-2955
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDA NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2016 |