THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:57:52 PM
Moazzam, Ambreen
CPSO#:
102206
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Ziauddin Medical University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON N7M 1C5
Phone: (519) 354-5540
Fax: 519-354-6120
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMBREEN MOAZZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAZZAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2015 |