THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:28:32 AM
Taghaddos, Seyed Nader
CPSO#:
102199
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Shiraz University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Urgent
Care Centre
Unit 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: 9054726081
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEYED NADER TAGHADDOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGHADDOS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2015 |