THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:45:04 AM
Patel, Sonal Jayantilal
CPSO#:
102186
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite C01
Unit A
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-2858
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SONAL JAYANTILAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2016 |