THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:15:24 AM
Ahmad, Sardar
CPSO#:
102159
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dari, English, Farsi, Hindi, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit # 2 - 4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester ON N0L 1G3
Phone: (519) 202-7391
Fax: (519) 202-7393
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARDAR AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2016 |