THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:38:37 PM
Blagojevic, Ana
CPSO#:
102125
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: 613-544-4900
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANA BLAGOJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAGOJEVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 18 Oct 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 10 Jan 2017 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2017 |