THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 7:10:51 AM
Mithani, Sharin
CPSO#:
102093
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Mahoon, Sharinbir (used until: 03 Feb 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 McGonigal St W
RCVTAC
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARIN MITHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITHANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2015 |